EP0854838 - HYDROGEN FLUORIDE RECOVERY PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineos Fluor Holdings Limited First Floor Offices Queens Gate 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Ineos Fluor Holdings Limited First Floor Offices Queens Gate 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB | ||
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EWING, Paul, Nicholas 14 Alexandra Road Stockton Heath Warrington Cheshire WA4 2UT / GB | 02 /
SHIELDS, Charles, John 49 Victoria Road Stockton Heath Warrington Cheshire WA4 2AL / GB | 03 /
ROBERTS, Christopher 13 Porter Close Rainhill Prescot Merseyside L35 6PY / GB | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1998/31] | Thomas, Ieuan, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96931180.2 | 24.09.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996GB02348 | Priority number, date | GB19950020644 | 10.10.1995 Original published format: GB 9520644 | GB19950020645 | 10.10.1995 Original published format: GB 9520645 | GB19960012118 | 10.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9612118 | GB19960012117 | 10.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9612117 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713719 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0854838 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854838 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C01B7/19 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
C01B7/195 (EP,US);
C01B7/19 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON WASSERSTOFFFLUORID | [1998/31] | English: | HYDROGEN FLUORIDE RECOVERY PROCESS | [1998/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION DE FLUORURE D'HYDROGENE | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 06.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2000 | CH | 20.12.2000 | FI | 20.12.2000 | LI | 20.12.2000 | SE | 20.12.2000 | DK | 20.03.2001 | PT | 20.03.2001 | [2003/46] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
CH | 20.12.2000 | ||
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
LI | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
CH | 20.12.2000 | ||
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
LI | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
CH | 20.12.2000 | ||
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
LI | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 20.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06107570 ; | [A]JPH05178768 ; | [A]JPS4945842 ; | [A]JPS5097594 ; | [A]GB1332968 (ICI LTD) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3947558 (VAN EIJL A THEODORUS) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0596514 (CONOCO INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9420412 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 20, Database accession no. 94-163857, XP002020352 & JPH06107570 A 19940419 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 33, Database accession no. 93-261601, XP002020353 & JPH05178768 A 19930720 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 02, Database accession no. 75-02816w, XP002020354 & JPS4945842 A 19741206 (ELECTRO CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 18, Database accession no. 77-31432y, XP002020355 & JPS5097594 A 19750802 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM IND) [A] 1 * abstract * |