Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0860075
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.08.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] |
03.05.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
01.11.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
14.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.04.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] |
17.03.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |
17.03.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |
11.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.07.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] |
10.07.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] |
19.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|