Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000501275 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9614272 | 04.09.1996 | US55562795 | 09.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0860075 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2000 | A4 | EP0860075 | 26.08.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9614272 | 04.09.1996 | US55562795 | 09.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9717795 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55562795 | 09.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5689230 | 18.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US55562795 | 09.11.1995 |