EP0852494 - PERIPHERALLY ACTIVE ANTI-HYPERALGESIC OPIATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 9500 Gilman Drive Mail Code 0093 La Jolla, CA 92093-0093 / US | For all designated states Adolor Corporation 395 Phoenixville Pike Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 9500 Gilman Drive La Jolla, CA 92093-0093 / US | ||
For all designated states Adolor Corporation 395 Phoenixville Pike Malvern, PA 19355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAKSH, Tony, L. 4219 St. James Place San Diego, CA 92103 / US | 02 /
FARRAR, John, J. 1066 Bodine Road Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US | 03 /
MAYCOCK, Alan, L. 1908 Standiford Drive Malvern, PA 19355 / US | 04 /
LEWIS, Michael, E. 1007 Saber Road West Chester, PA 19382 / US | 05 /
DOW, Gordon, J. 4189 Chaparral Court Santa Rosa, CA 95409 / US | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1998/29] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96931567.0 | 12.09.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996US14727 | Priority number, date | US19950528510 | 12.09.1995 Original published format: US 528510 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9709973 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0852494 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/17, A61K31/41, A61K31/435, A61K31/445, A61K31/415, A61K31/535, A61P29/00 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/17 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/451 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/14] | A61K31/00, A61K31/445, A61K31/17, A61K31/41, A61K31/435, A61K31/415, A61K31/535 | ||
Former IPC [1998/29] | A61K31/00, A61K31/17, A61K31/41, A61K31/435, A61K31/445, A61K31/415, A61K31/535 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/29] | Extension states | AL | 14.04.1998 | LT | 14.04.1998 | LV | 14.04.1998 | SI | 14.04.1998 | Title | German: | PERIPHERAL WIRKSAME ANTI-HYPERALGESISCHE OPIATE | [1998/29] | English: | PERIPHERALLY ACTIVE ANTI-HYPERALGESIC OPIATES | [1998/29] | French: | OPIACES ANTI-HYPERALGESIQUES A ACTION PERIPHERIQUE | [1998/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/04] | 24.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2100711 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [X] 1-460 * the whole document *; | [X]US4277605 (BUYNISKI JOSEPH P, et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0127154 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0582727 (LINTEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5354863 (DAPPEN MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1,2; | [X] - SMITH, T.W. ET AL., "Peripheral antinociceptive effects of N-Methyl Morphine", LIFE SCIENCES, (1982), vol. 31, pages 1205 - 1208, XP000611242 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0024-3205(82)90343-5 | [X] - GOTTSCHLICH, R. ET AL., "The Peripherally acting kappa-opiate agonist EMD 61753 and analogues: Opioid activity versus peripheral selectivity.", DRUGS EXPTL. CLIN. RES., (1995), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 171 - 174, XP000609171 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - MOLINA, N. ET. AL, "The peripheral analgesic effects of Morphine, Codeine, Pentazocine and D-Propoxyphene.", BRAZILIAN J. MED. BIOL. RES., (1983), vol. 16, pages 345 - 352, XP000609164 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [X] - LEVINE, J.D.; TAIWO, Y.O., "Involvement of the mu-Opiate receptor in peripheral analgesia.", NEUROSCIENCE, (1989), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 571 - 576, XP000609169 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4522(89)90279-0 | [X] - MACKERER ET AL., "Loperamide binding to opiate receptor sites of brain and myenteric plexus.", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1976), vol. 199, pages 131 - 140, XP000670263 [X] 1-460 * the whole document * | [X] - MACKERER ET AL., "Review of the Involvement of Opiate Receptors in Producing the Central and Peripheral Effects Caused by two New Antidiarrheal Drugs, Loperamide and SC-27166.", J. AM. COLL. TOXICOL., (1984), vol. 3, pages 81 - 91, XP000670159 [X] 1-460 * the whole document * | [X] - NIEMEGEERS ET AL., "Dissociation between Opiate-Like and Antidiarrheal Activities of Antidiarrheal Drugs", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1979), vol. 210, no. 3, pages 327 - 333, XP000670158 [X] 1-460 * the whole document * | [X] - MACKERER ET AL., "Antidiarrheal and central nervous system activities of SC-27166 (2-[3-5-methyl-1,3,4-oxadiazol-2-yl)-3,3-diphenylpropyl]-2-azabicyclo[2.2.2]octane), a new antidiarrheal agent, resulting from binding to opiate receptor sites of brain and myenteric plexus", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1977), vol. 203, no. 3, pages 527 - 538, XP000670177 [X] 1-460 * the whole document * | [X] - MEGENS ET AL., "Normalization of small intestinal propulsion with loperamide-like antidiarrheals in rats.", EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (1990), vol. 178, no. 3, pages 357 - 364, XP000670152 [X] 1-7,9-460 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(90)90115-M | [X] - ADELSTEIN ET AL., "3,3-Diphenyl-3-(2-alkyl-1,3,4-oxadiazol-5-yl)propylcycloalkylamines, a Novel Series of Antidiarrheal Agents.", J. MED. CHEM., (1976), vol. 19, no. 10, pages 1221 - 1225, XP002029507 [X] 1-460 * the whole document * | [XY] - VAN DER KOOY, D., "Hyperalgesic Functions of Peripheral Opiate Receptors", ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1986), vol. 467, pages 154 - 168, XP000609166 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 1-460 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1986.tb14626.x | [Y] - GOODMAN ET AL., The pharmacological basis of Therapeutics, NEW YORK, MACMILLAN, (1985), 131620, XP002029508 [Y] 1-460 * page 512, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 514, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [X] - STOKBROEKX ET AL., "Synthetic Antidiarrheal Agents. 2,2-diphenyl-4-(4'-aryl-4'hydroxypiperidino)butyramides", J. MED. CHEM., P0C038, (1973), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 782 - 786, XP000567748 [X] 1-460 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00265a009 | [X] - MEGENS ET AL., "Is In Vivo Dissociation Between the Antipropulsive and Antidiarrheal Porperties of Opioids in Rats Related to Gut Selectivity?", ARCH. INT. PHARMACODYN. THER., (1989), vol. 298, pages 220 - 229, XP000670160 [X] 1-460 * the whole document * |