EP0929690 - GLUCOSE SYRUP HAVING SPECIFIC PROPERTIES AND PROCESS FOR OBTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMYLUM EUROPE N.V. Burchtstraat 10 9300 Aalst / BE | [2000/49] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states AMYLUM BELGUIM N.V. Burchtstraat 10 9300 Aalst / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERPLAETSE, Alex, René, Julien, Remi August Van Geertstraat 41 B-9040 Sint-Amandsberg / BE | 02 /
RUTTENS, Koenraad, Frans, Paul Voorjaastraat 14 B-9000 Gent / BE | 03 /
VAN LANCKER, Frank, Robert, Gabriel, Maria Waterstraat 160 B-9040 Sint-Amandsberg / BE | 04 /
DESTEXHE, Alain, Michel, Pierre Neerstraat 21, bus 2 B-1730 Asse / BE | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Leherte, Georges M.L.M. K.O.B. N.V. Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Leherte, Georges M.L.M., Dr. K.O.B. n.v., Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 96931816.1 | 17.09.1996 | [1999/29] | WO1996EP04088 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812342 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929690 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929690 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/14, C12P19/22, C13K1/06 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
C13K1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Title | German: | GLUCOSESIRUP MIT SPEZIELLEN EIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1999/29] | English: | GLUCOSE SYRUP HAVING SPECIFIC PROPERTIES AND PROCESS FOR OBTAINING THE SAME | [1999/29] | French: | SIROP DE GLUCOSE AYANT DES PROPRIETES SPECIFIQUES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT SIROP | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 09.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 17.04.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 12.12.2001 | FI | 12.12.2001 | GR | 12.12.2001 | LI | 12.12.2001 | DK | 12.03.2002 | PT | 12.03.2002 | SE | 12.03.2002 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/01] | CH | 12.12.2001 | |
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 12.12.2001 | |
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 12.12.2001 | |
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 12.12.2001 | |
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 12.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3012143 (APV PARALEC LTD) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]DE4125969 (CERESAN GMBH MARKRANSTAEDT [DE]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X] - LEROY, P., "Les édulcorants dérivés de l'amidon", LABO-PHARMA-PROBL. TECH., (1981), vol. 29, no. 310, pages 443 - 447, XP000653234 [X] 1-14 * page 444 * |