EP0804103 - SHOE ASSEMBLY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. Lieudit La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [2000/30] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states Salomon S.A. Lieu dit La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURDEAU, Joel Résidence Fer Donjean F-74410 Saint-Jorioz / FR | 02 /
SARTOR, Mariano Via Barile, 8 I-31044 Montebelluna / IT | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Lejeune, Benoît Salomon S.A.S D.J.P.I. 74996 Annecy Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Lejeune, Benoit Salomon S.A. D.J.P.I. 74996 Annecy Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96931838.5 | 13.09.1996 | [1997/45] | WO1996FR01420 | Priority number, date | FR19950011009 | 14.09.1995 Original published format: FR 9511009 | [1997/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709893 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804103 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0804103 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A43B9/00, A43B5/04 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
A43B5/16 (EP,US);
A43B5/0401 (EP,US);
A43B5/0482 (EP,US);
A43B5/0486 (EP,US);
A43B5/0488 (EP,US);
A43B9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1997/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENBAU EINES SCHUHES | [1997/45] | English: | SHOE ASSEMBLY METHOD | [1997/45] | French: | PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE CHAUSSURE | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1685348 (MUNARI GIOVANNI BATTISTA) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2643796 (MARQUET CIE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |