EP0852638 - DRYER FABRIC SEAMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCAPA GROUP PLC Oakfield House, 93 Preston New Road Blackburn Lancashire BB2 6AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states SCAPA GROUP PLC Oakfield House, 93 Preston New Road Blackburn, Lancashire BB2 6AY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLDEN, David 147 Lammack Road Blackburn Lancashire BB1 8LA / GB | 02 /
COOP, Philip Micklebring Whinney Lane Langho Blackburn Lancashire BB6 8DQ / GB | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Middlemist, Ian Alastair, et al Wilson Gunn M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester, M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96931915.1 | 30.09.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996GB02388 | Priority number, date | GB19950019837 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: GB 9519837 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713028 | Date: | 10.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852638 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852638 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
D21F1/0054 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S162/904 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/192 (EP,US);
Y10T428/197 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/29] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG VON TROCKENTUCHENDEN | [1999/05] | English: | DRYER FABRIC SEAMING | [1998/29] | French: | COUTURE DE TISSU SECHEUR | [1998/29] |
Former [1998/29] | VERBINDUNG VON TROCKENTUCH | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 27.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 01.12.1999 | [2008/24] | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0274244 (SCAPA PORRITT LTD [GB]); | [A]WO8908740 (OLSON JAMES [SE]) |