Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11511563 | Global Dossier | 05.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9614848 | 16.09.1996 | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU711079B | Global Dossier | 07.10.1999 | B2 | AU7110796 | 09.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9614848 | 16.09.1996 | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0852007 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2004 | B1 | EP0852007 | 08.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9614848 | 16.09.1996 | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE271220T | 15.07.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9614848 | 16.09.1996 | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2228520 | 20.02.2007 | C | CA2228520 | 27.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9614848 | 16.09.1996 | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69632913T | 21.07.2005 | T2 | DE69632913D1 | 19.08.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9614848 | 16.09.1996 | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9711363 | Global Dossier | 27.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2227605T | 01.04.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5753094 | 19.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US53095795 | 20.09.1995 |