EP0852007 - BORATE STORAGE BUFFER AND SAMPLE DILUENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 N Harbor Boulevard, PO Box 3100 Fullerton, CA 92834-3100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 N Harbor Boulevard, PO Box 3100 Fullerton, CA 92834-3100 / US | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 N Harbor Boulevard, PO Box 3100 Fullerton, CA 92834-3100 / US | ||
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92834-3100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTER, Stephen, C. 18001 Biglow Park Tustin, CA 92680 / US | 02 /
KIM, Elsie, H. 159 Greenfield Irvine, CA 92714 / US | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96932238.7 | 16.09.1996 | [1998/28] | WO1996US14848 | Priority number, date | US19950530957 | 20.09.1995 Original published format: US 530957 | [1998/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711363 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852007 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852007 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447, G01N33/50 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
G01N27/44747 (EP,US);
G01N27/44704 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/28] | Title | German: | BORATHALTIGE SPEICHERPUFFER UND PROBENVERDÜNNER | [2004/10] | English: | BORATE STORAGE BUFFER AND SAMPLE DILUENT | [1998/28] | French: | TAMPON DE STOCKAGE DE BORATE ET DILUANT D'ECHANTILLON | [1998/28] |
Former [1998/28] | BORATHALTIGE SPEICHERPUFFER UND PROBEVERDÜNNER | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2004 | BE | 14.07.2004 | FI | 14.07.2004 | IE | 16.09.2004 | LU | 16.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | DK | 14.10.2004 | GR | 14.10.2004 | SE | 14.10.2004 | PT | 14.12.2004 | NL | 01.04.2005 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.09.2004 | ||
LU | 16.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
NL | 01.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
NL | 01.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 14.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0135278 (OISHI MICHIO [JP]) [A] 9,11 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5120413 (CHEN FU-TAI A [US], et al) [DA] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0494544 (SUPELCO INC [US]) [A] 1,2,7,8,12-18,21,28-33 * page 5, line 26 - line 39 * * claim 12 *; | [X]US5431793 (WANG HANN-PING [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,12-16,22-26,28-33 * column 3, line 47 - line 59 * * column 4, line 24 - line 47 *; | [A] - LANDERS J P ET AL, "HIGH-PERFORMANCE CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORESIS OF GLYCOPROTEINS: THE USE OF MODIFIERS OF ELECTROOSMOTIC FLOW FOR ANALYSIS OF MICROHETEROGENEITY", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (19920815), vol. 205, no. 1, pages 115 - 124, XP000294455 [A] 1-33 * page 116, column R, paragraph 2; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(92)90587-W | [DA] - CHEN F T A, "CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORESIS-A NEW CLINICAL TOOL", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (19910101), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 14 - 19, XP000368715 [DA] 1-33 | [A] - NORBERTO A. GUZMAN ET AL., "Effect of buffer constituents on the determination of therapeutic proteins by cappillary electrophoresis", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1992), vol. 608, no. 1-2, pages 197 - 204, XP000616742 [A] 1-33 * page 199, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(92)87124-Q | [A] - SABRINA HOFFSTETTER-KUHN ET AL., "Influence of borate complexation on the electrophoretic behavior of carbohydrates in capillary electrophoresis", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 63, no. 15, pages 1541 - 1547, XP000616743 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00015a009 | Examination | - Affidavit of S.C. Alter, Inventor, 14.1.1997 | - SEGEL IH: "Biochemical Calculations", 1976, JOHN WILEY & CO, NEW YORK, US | - WEAST R.C. (ED): "Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, 53rd Edition", 1972, THE CHEMICAL RUBBER COMPANY, CLEVELAND, US | - WEAST, R.C. (ED): "Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, 59th Edition", 1978, THE CHEMICAL RUBBER COMPANY, CLEVELAND, US |