EP0959835 - PACKAGING FOR A SANITARY NAPKIN OR LIKE ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Mölnlycke AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMUELSSON, Ann Flintstensvägen 28 S-437 32 Lindome / SE | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/48] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Göteborgs Patentbyra Dahls AB Box 606 182 16 Danderyd / SE | Application number, filing date | 96932899.6 | 06.09.1996 | [1999/48] | WO1996SE01111 | Priority number, date | SE19950003401 | 02.10.1995 Original published format: SE 9503401 | [1999/48] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712572 | Date: | 10.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959835 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
A61F13/5514 (EP,US);
B65D75/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/48] | Title | German: | PACKUNG FÜR EINE BINDE ODER EINEN ÄHNLICHEN ARTIKEL | [1999/48] | English: | PACKAGING FOR A SANITARY NAPKIN OR LIKE ARTICLE | [1999/48] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR UN ARTICLE TEL QU'UNE GARNITURE HYGIENIQUE | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1997 | Translation filed | 09.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.1998 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 31.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/41] | 10.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0357298 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |