blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0852526

EP0852526 - METHOD OF MAKING METAL COMPOSITE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NYGREN, Mats
Västerled 181
S-161 42 Bromma / SE
02 / WESTIN, Gunnar
Storgatan 44
S-114 55 Stockholm / SE
03 / EKSTRAND, Asa
Carl Bondes Väg 82
S-165 74 Hässelby / SE
[1998/29]
Representative(s)Östlund, Alf Olof Anders, et al
Sandvik AB
Patent Department
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]Östlund, Alf Olof Anders, et al
Sandvik AB Patent Department
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Application number, filing date96932913.527.09.1996
[1998/29]
WO1996SE01213
Priority number, dateSE1995000341929.09.1995         Original published format: SE 9503419
[1998/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9711804
Date:03.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0852526
Date:15.07.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0852526
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE03.04.1997
ClassificationIPC:B22F9/24, C22C29/00
[1998/29]
CPC:
B22F9/30 (EP,US); B22F1/18 (EP,US); C22C1/051 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1998/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLKOMPOSITMATERIALIEN[1998/29]
English:METHOD OF MAKING METAL COMPOSITE MATERIALS[1998/29]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE MATERIAUX COMPOSITES METALLIQUES[1998/29]
Entry into regional phase27.02.1998National basic fee paid 
27.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
27.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/29]
14.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1999Fee for grant paid
23.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.11.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)09.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08]
Request for further processing for:29.11.1999Request for further processing filed
29.11.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.12.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT08.03.2000
[2008/06]
Cited inInternational search[A]JP62192501  ;
 [A]JP63069901  ;
 [A]US4233063  (RITSKO JOSEPH E, et al);
 [AP]WO9526245  (SANDVIK AB [SE])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 12, No. 39, M-665; & JP,A,62 192 501 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP), 24 August 1987., & JP62192501 A 19870824
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 12, No. 292, M-729; & JP,A,63 069 901 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD), 30 March 1988., & JP63069901 A 19880330
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.