blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0850181

EP0850181 - BIODEGRADABLE MOLDED PACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Environmental Packing, L.P.
Suite 2K, 3521 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19810 / US
[1998/27]
Inventor(s)01 / REDD, Randall, Vann
27 Longspur Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808-1972 / US
02 / SCHIEWETZ, Don, Boyd
5 West Court
Wilmington, DE 19810-2534 / US
[1998/27]
Representative(s)Jones, Alan John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]Jones, Alan John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date96932935.823.08.1996
[1998/27]
WO1996US13681
Priority number, dateUS1995052532908.09.1995         Original published format: US 525329
[1998/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9709248
Date:13.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0850181
Date:01.07.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0850181
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:B65D81/05, C08J9/224, C08J9/00, C08J9/12, // C08L3:02
[1998/27]
CPC:
C08J9/0061 (EP); B65D81/1075 (EP); C08J9/125 (EP);
C08J9/224 (EP); C08J9/232 (EP); B65D2565/384 (EP);
C08J2303/02 (EP); C08J2429/00 (EP); Y02W30/80 (EP);
Y02W90/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1998/27]
TitleGerman:Biologisch abbaubare,geformte Verpackung[1998/27]
English:BIODEGRADABLE MOLDED PACKING[1998/27]
French:EMBALLAGE MOULE BIODEGRADABLE[1998/27]
Entry into regional phase20.02.1998National basic fee paid 
20.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
03.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.1999Fee for grant paid
07.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9410063  (JARVIS PACKAGING & DESIGNS INC [US]) [Y] 10-18 * figures 8,9 * * claim - *;
 [AD]US5413855  (KOLASKA KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [AD] 1-18* the whole document *;
 [XY]EP0667369  (NOVAMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [Y] 10-18
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.