EP0858334 - ANALGESIC IMMEDIATE AND CONTROLLED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.H. FAULDING & CO. LIMITED 115 Sherriff Street Underdale, South Australia 5032 / AU | [1998/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Ian, Keith 11 Athol Avenue Blair Athol, S.A. 5084 / AU | 02 /
HEINICKE, Grant, Wayne 14 Baudin Avenue Fairview Park, S.A. 5126 / AU | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96933279.0 | 18.10.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996AU00658 | Priority number, date | AU1995PN06057 | 19.10.1995 Original published format: AU PN605795 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714415 | Date: | 24.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858334 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485, A61K31/00, A61P25/00, A61P25/28 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
A61K9/5084 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/34] | A61K31/385 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Title | German: | ANALGETIKUM MIT RASCHER UND VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2003/09] | English: | ANALGESIC IMMEDIATE AND CONTROLLED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [1998/34] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE ANALGESIQUE A LIBERATION IMMEDIATE ET A LIBERATION LENTE | [1998/34] |
Former [1998/34] | ANALGETIKUM MIT RASCHER UND VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUMG | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 15.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/17] | 21.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0459695 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [Y] 7,8 * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US5238686 (EICHEL HERMAN J [US], et al) [Y] 7-11,26-32 * column W *; | [Y]US5382601 (NUERNBERG EBERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 9-11 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5436255 (BUTLER TODD W [US]) [Y] 26-32* claims 2-8 * | International search | [X]GB2189995 (ALZA CORP); | [X]US4859462 (CHOW SAN-LAUNG [US], et al); | [X]US4859461 (CHOW SAN-LAUNG [US], et al); | [X]US5084278 (MEHTA ATUL M [US]); | [X]US5156842 (MULLIGAN SEAMUS [IE]); | [X]US5238686 (EICHEL HERMAN J [US], et al) |