EP0856352 - POLYSULFONE MEMBRANE FOR PURIFYING BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | ||
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Morikazu 34-12-13, Nagata Sanodai, Minami-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 232 / JP | 02 /
NITADORI, Yoshiaki 310-11, Miyashita Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416 / JP | 03 /
KIGUCHI, Akira 3-5-25-501, Bessho, Minami-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 232 / JP | 04 /
MUKAIYAMA, Shigemi 3-1-1-103, Okubo, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 233 / JP | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1998/32] | Application number, filing date | 96933609.8 | 09.10.1996 | [1998/32] | WO1996JP02940 | Priority number, date | JP19950286332 | 09.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28633295 | [1998/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713575 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856352 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856352 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/68, B01D71/28, B01D71/38, B01D67/00 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
B01D71/80 (EP,US);
B01D67/00165 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
B01D71/281 (EP,US);
B01D71/441 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D71/78 (EP,US);
B01D2323/12 (EP,US);
B01D2323/30 (EP,US);
B01D2325/341 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/32] | B01D71/68, B01D71/28, B01D71/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/32] | Title | German: | POLYSULFON-MEMBRAN ZUR REINIGUNG VON BLUT | [1998/32] | English: | POLYSULFONE MEMBRANE FOR PURIFYING BLOOD | [1998/32] | French: | MEMBRANE EN POLYSULFONE POUR PURIFIER LE SANG | [1998/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1998 | Translation filed | 06.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 06.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 09.07.2003 | GB | 09.10.2003 | SE | 09.10.2003 | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/16] | NL | 09.07.2003 | |
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 09.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5750506 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [Y]JPS60206404 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO); | [Y]JPH02115028 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]JPH03161033 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [X]JPH06165926 (KURARAY CO) |