EP0883664 - INTEGRATED HYDROPROCESSING SCHEME WITH SEGREGATED RECYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The M.W. Kellogg Company 601 Jefferson Avenue Houston Texas 77002-7990 / US | For all designated states ExxonMobil Oil Corporation 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VA 22037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states The M.W. Kellogg Company 601 Jefferson Avenue Houston, Texas 77002-7990 / US | ||
For all designated states EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VI 22037-0001 / US | |||
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states The M.W. Kellogg Company 601 Jefferson Avenue Houston, Texas 77002-7990 / US | ||
For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, Virginia 22037-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEBEL, Kenneth, W. 5135 Ancinetta Drive Schnecksville, PA 18078 / US | 02 /
HILBERT, Timothy, Lee 17 Charles Lane Sewell, NJ 08080 / US | 03 /
HUNTER, Michael, G. 22322 Crystal Bay Drive Katy, TX 77450 / US | 04 /
PAPPAL, David, A. 118 Peyton Avenue Haddonfield, NJ 08033 / US | 05 /
GENTRY, Arthur, R. 17322 Taylorcrest Houston, TX 77079 / US | 06 /
PARTRIDGE, Randall, David 229 Mountwell Avenue Haddonfield, NJ 08033 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96934152.8 | 11.10.1996 | [1998/51] | WO1996US16231 | Priority number, date | US19950578295 | 26.12.1995 Original published format: US 578295 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9723584 | Date: | 03.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883664 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C10G65/12, C10G73/38 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
C10G65/12 (EP,KR);
C10G73/38 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1998/51] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES WASSERSTOFFBEHANDLUNGSSCHEMA MIT GETRENNTEM RECYCLING | [1998/51] | English: | INTEGRATED HYDROPROCESSING SCHEME WITH SEGREGATED RECYCLE | [1998/51] | French: | SYSTEME D'HYDROCRAQUAGE INTEGRE A RECYCLAGE SEPARE | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/46] | 09.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US5275719 (BAKER JR CHARLES L [US], et al); | [Y]US4764266 (CHEN NAI Y [US], et al); | [Y]US4944862 (CHEN NAI Y [US], et al); | [A]US3681232 (EGAN CLARK J); | [A]US3790472 (WHITE R); | [A]US4347121 (MAYER JEROME F, et al); | [A]US4414097 (CHESTER ARTHUR W [US], et al); | [A]US4851109 (CHEN NAI Y [US], et al); | [A]US4975177 (GARWOOD WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US5037528 (GARWOOD WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US5053117 (KYAN CHWAN P [US], et al); | [A]US5288395 (MARLER DAVID O [US], et al); | [A]US5358628 (APELIAN MINAS R [US], et al); | [A]US5447621 (HUNTER MICHAEL G [US]); | [A]US5460713 (TAKITO TETSUO [JP], et al); | [A]US5462650 (TAKITO TETSUO [JP], et al); | [A]US5468368 (BAKER JR CHARLES L [US], et al) |