EP0936946 - IONIZING AND POLARIZING ELECTRONIC AIR FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joannou, Constantinos J. 62 Lortie Street Aylmer Quebec J9H 4G5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Joannou, Constantinos J. 62 Lortie Street Aylmer, Quebec J9H 4G5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96934280.7 | 08.11.1996 | [1999/34] | WO1996CA00730 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9820978 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936946 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936946 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B03C3/155, B03C3/41 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
B03C3/38 (EP);
B03C3/155 (EP);
B03C3/41 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/34] | Title | German: | IONISIERENDE UND POLARISIERENDE ELEKTRONISCHE LUFTFILTER | [1999/34] | English: | IONIZING AND POLARIZING ELECTRONIC AIR FILTER | [1999/34] | French: | FILTRE A AIR ELECTRONIQUE IONISANT ET POLARISANT | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 08.05.2002 | FI | 08.05.2002 | FR | 08.05.2002 | IT | 08.05.2002 | LI | 08.05.2002 | NL | 08.05.2002 | DE | 09.08.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 08.05.2002 | |
FI | 08.05.2002 | ||
FR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DE | 09.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/40] | CH | 08.05.2002 | |
FI | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DE | 09.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | CH | 08.05.2002 | |
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DE | 09.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | CH | 08.05.2002 | |
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DE | 09.08.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | CH | 08.05.2002 | |
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DE | 09.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | CH | 08.05.2002 | |
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 08.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2124215 (SOLTIS CHARLES) [X] 1,7-9,11,15,18 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 20; figures 2,3; claims 1,3,4 *; | [A]US4098591 (VAN DIEPENBROEK ALFRED ERICH W, et al) [A] 1,3,5 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 4; figures 1,2; claims 1,2,6,8 *; | [A]DE3634538 (HOELTER HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2265556 (GIBBS ROBERT WILLIAM [CA]) [A] 1-3,7,8,11,12,14,15,18 * page 7, paragraph 3; figure 1; claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0585054 (COLT INT HOLDINGS [CH], et al) [A] 1,3,7,11,12,15,16,18 * column 3, line 5 - line 25 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 2; claims 1,2,7-9 *; | [E]US5573577 (JOANNOU CONSTANTINOS J [CA]) [E] 11-20 * claims 1-11 * |