EP0935493 - DEVICE TO INFLUENCE THE DRIVING PERFORMANCE OF A REMOTE-CONTROLLED MODEL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graupner GmbH & Co. KG Henriettenstr. 94-96 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | [2001/38] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states GM Racing Modellsportvertrieb GmbH Romantische Strasse 33 86720 Nördlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELBING, Ralf Diözesanstrasse D-73433 Aalen-Hofen / DE | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Kratzsch, Volkhard, et al Patentanwalt Mülbergerstrasse 65 73728 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Kratzsch, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Mülbergerstrasse 65 73728 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [1999/33] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96934521.4 | 02.10.1996 | [1999/33] | WO1996EP04303 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814253 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0935493 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0935493 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63H30/04 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
A63H30/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEEINFLUSSUNG DES FAHRVERHALTENS VON FERNGESTEUERTEN MODELLFAHRZEUGEN | [1999/33] | English: | DEVICE TO INFLUENCE THE DRIVING PERFORMANCE OF A REMOTE-CONTROLLED MODEL VEHICLE | [1999/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR AGIR SUR LA QUALITE DE CONDUITE DE VEHICULES EN MODELES REDUITS TELECOMMANDES | [1999/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 24.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.03.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 25.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9414511 ; | [A]FR2397001 (ANVAR [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 21 * * page 9, line 1 - line 17 *; | [A]US4213270 (ODA NOBUO [JP]); | [A]US5507455 (YANG RO-KING [TW]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - line 43 * * column 3, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 28, Database accession no. 94-234381, XP002032214 & WO9414511 A 19940707 (SACOM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |