EP0873661 - A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM AND A METHOD OF PROVIDING SERVICES TO TERMINALS IN SUCH A SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1998/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, William, Neil 15 Wentworth Close, Weybourne Farnham, Surrey GU9 9HH / GB | 02 /
WHINNETT, Nicholas, William 211A St. John's Hill London SW11 1TH / GB | 03 /
GIBBS, Jonathan, Alastair 56 Malvern Gardens, Hedge End Southampton, Hampshire SO30 2UL / GB | 04 /
VAN DEN HEUVEL, Anthony "Carrigaline", Lightwater Road Lightwater, Surrey GU18 5XB / GB | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Ibbotson, Harold, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property, Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Ibbotson, Harold, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property, Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96934599.0 | 10.10.1996 | [1998/44] | WO1996EP04385 | Priority number, date | GB19950025450 | 08.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9525450 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722217 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0873661 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
H04M3/42 (EP);
H04M2242/22 (EP);
H04M3/42102 (EP);
H04Q3/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/44] | Extension states | LT | 08.07.1998 | LV | 08.07.1998 | SI | 08.07.1998 | Title | German: | TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSORGUNG MIT DIENSTEN ZU ENDGERÄTEN IN EINEM SOLCHEN SYSTEM | [1998/44] | English: | A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM AND A METHOD OF PROVIDING SERVICES TO TERMINALS IN SUCH A SYSTEM | [1998/44] | French: | SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR DES SERVICES A DES TERMINAUX DANS UN TEL SYSTEME | [1998/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 01.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/45] | 05.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0048868 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 21 ** page 5, line 32 - line 36 *; | [A]WO9112698 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,7 * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 7 * * page 12, line 24 - line 38 *; | [A]WO9307566 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-3,5,7-9,11 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 19 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 12 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 26 * * page 9, line 31 - page 14, line 10 * * page 18, line 3 - line 5 * * page 18, line 11 - page 19, line 25 * * page 21, line 1 - line 33 * * figures 1-3,7 *; | [A]WO9507009 (NEDERLAND PTT [NL], et al) [A] 1,7 * page 11, line 5 - line 19 * * page 12, line 15 - line 27 *; | [X]EP0685972 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 12 - line 45 * * column 5, line 2 - line 34 * * column 6, line 21 - line 46 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 6 * * column 8, line 55 - line 58 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 9 * * figure 2 *; | [A] - REGNIER J ET AL, "PERSONAL COMMUNICATION SERVICES-THE NEW POTS", GLOBECOM 1990, SAN DIEGO; INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19901202), vol. 1 OF 3, pages 420 - 426, XP000218765 [A] 1,7 * page 420, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 420, column R, paragraph 7 * * page 421, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 4 * * page 422, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 422, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 422, column R, paragraph 5 * * page 423, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 4 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1990.116548 | [A] - SUNDBORG J, "UNIVERSAL PERSONAL TELECOMMUNICATION (UPT) - CONCEPT AND STANDARDISATION", ERICSSON REVIEW, (19930101), vol. 70, no. 4, pages 140 - 155, XP000406698 [A] 1,7 * page 141, column R, paragraph 2 - page 142, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 143, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 148, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 150, column R, paragraph 3 - paragraph L * * figures 3,12 * |