EP0857060 - METHOD AND PREPARATIONS FOR STABILIZING BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS BY DRYING METHODS WITHOUT FREEZING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH 68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTERN, Markus Friedrichstr. 17 D-64646 Heppenheim / DE | 02 /
WINTER, Gerhard Jahnstrasse 20E D-69221 Dossenheim / DE | [1998/43] |
Former [1998/33] | 01 /
MATTERN, Markus Am alten Neckar 7 D-64646 Heppenheim / DE | ||
02 /
WINTER, Gerhard Jahnstrasse 20E D-69221 Dossenheim / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/22] | Braun, Axel, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 96934811.9 | 24.10.1996 | [1998/33] | WO1996EP04627 | Priority number, date | DE1995139574 | 25.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19539574 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9715288 | Date: | 01.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0857060 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857060 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K47/18, A61K47/26 | [1998/33] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/33] | Extension states | SI | 25.05.1998 | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG BIOLOGISCHER MATERIALIEN MITTELS TROCKNUNGSVERFAHREN OHNE EINFRIEREN | [1998/33] | English: | METHOD AND PREPARATIONS FOR STABILIZING BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS BY DRYING METHODS WITHOUT FREEZING | [1998/33] | French: | PREPARATIONS ET PROCEDES POUR STABILISER DES MATERIAUX BIOLOGIQUES A L'AIDE DE PROCEDES DE DESSICCATION SANS CONGELATION | [1998/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 10.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2002
08.11.2002
ADMISSIBLE Nektar Therapeutics 150 Industrial Road San Carlos, California 94070-6256 / US Opponent's representative Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2002
08.11.2002
ADMISSIBLE Nektar Therapeutics 150 Industrial Road San Carlos, California 94070-6256 / US Opponent's representative Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2002
08.11.2002
ADMISSIBLE Inhale Therapeutic Systems, Inc. 150 Industrial Road San Carlos, CA 94070-6256 / US Opponent's representative Baldock, Sharon Claire BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 04.12.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.08.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.08.2004 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.08.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.12.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/17] | Appeal following opposition | 27.10.2004 | Appeal received No. T1283/04 | 23.12.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 25.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.01.2002 | LI | 30.01.2002 | [2011/38] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0306824 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,16,17 * page 4 - page 5; example 1 *; | [X]EP0325112 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,12,14-17,26-28 * claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]WO9012029 (IMMUNOBIOLOGY RES INST INC [US]) [A] 1-28* page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 4 *; | [X]EP0444692 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,11,12,14-18,26-28 * page 6; example 1 *; | [X]EP0547422 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,12,13,16-18,26-28 * page 26; example 1 *; | [X]DE4242863 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 16,17 * page 6 - page 7; example 4 * |