EP0858338 - USE OF LEVO-ENANTIOMERS OF MEDETOMIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/34] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF LEVO-ENANTIOMERS OF MEDETOMIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE | ||
[2001/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORION-YHTYMÄ OY Orionintie 1 02200 Espoo / FI | For all designated states Akerman, Karl E.O. Virmuntie 14 20540 Turku / FI | For all designated states Jansson, Christian Välskärinkatu 41 B 7 20570 Turku / FI | For all designated states Kukkonen, Jyrki Itäinen Pitkäkatu 16 B 20520 Turku / FI | [1998/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERMAN, Karl, E., O. Virmuntie 14 FIN-20540 Turku / FI | 02 /
JANSSON, Christian Välskärinkatu 41 B 7 FIN-20570 Turku / FI | 03 /
KUKKONEN, Jyrki Itäinen Pitkäkatu 16 B FIN-20520 Turku / FI | 04 /
SAVOLA, Juha-Matti Siutlankatu 8 FIN-20380 Turku / FI | 05 /
WURSTER, Siegfried Uudenmaantie 70 A 19 FIN-20720 Turku / FI | 06 /
COCKCROFT, Victor Yliopistonkatu 5 A 9 FIN-20110 Turku / FI | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Sexton, Jane Helen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96934847.3 | 23.10.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996FI00560 | Priority number, date | GB19950021680 | 23.10.1995 Original published format: GB 9521680 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9715302 | Date: | 01.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858338 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858338 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (KR);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/38 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Extension states | LT | 21.04.1998 | LV | 21.04.1998 | SI | 21.04.1998 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON LEVO-ENANTIOMEREN DES MEDETOMIDINS | [2001/16] | English: | USE OF LEVO-ENANTIOMERS OF MEDETOMIDINE DERIVATIVES | [2001/16] | French: | UTILISATION DE LEVO-ENANTIOMERES DE DERIVES DE MEDETOMIDINE | [2001/16] |
Former [1998/34] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON LEVO-ENANTIOMEREN DES MEDETOMIDINS IND IHRE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [1998/34] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF LEVO-ENANTIOMERS OF MEDETOMIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE | ||
Former [1998/34] | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A BASE DE LEVO-ENANTIOMERES DE DERIVES DE MEDETOMIDINE ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 28.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Request for further processing for: | 26.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.2002 | BE | 05.06.2002 | CH | 05.06.2002 | FI | 05.06.2002 | GR | 05.06.2002 | LI | 05.06.2002 | NL | 05.06.2002 | DK | 05.09.2002 | PT | 05.09.2002 | SE | 05.09.2002 | IE | 23.10.2002 | LU | 23.10.2002 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
LU | 23.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 05.06.2002 | |
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 05.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0300652 (FARMOS OY [FI]) [DX] 11,14 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO9221338 (ORION YHTYMAE OY [FI]) [DX] 11-16 * the whole document *; | [X] - M. HONG ET AL, "Stereoselective effects of central alpha2-adrenergic agonist medetomidine on in vivo catechol activity in the rat rostral ventrolateral medulla.", BRAIN RES., (1992), vol. 592, no. 1-2, pages 163 - 169, XP000617961 [X] 11,14-16 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-8993(92)91671-Z | [A] - J.M. SAVOLA, "Cardiovascular actions of medetomidine and their reversal by atipamezole.", ACTA VET. SCAND.,SUPPL., (1989), vol. 85, pages 39 - 47, XP000618077 |