EP0806119 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR INTEFERENCE-PROTECTED POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states Nokia Telecommunications Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VÄISÄNEN, Hannu Kerrostie 8 F FIN-90940 Jääli / FI | 02 /
METTOVAARA, Tarmo Kihokkitie 5 C 3 FIN-90160 Oulu / FI | 03 /
SAUKKO, Kari Tuulikintie 8 E 205 FIN-90570 Oulu / FI | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Karppinen, Olavi Arto, et al Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Karppinen, Olavi Arto, et al Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96934866.3 | 30.10.1996 | [1997/46] | WO1996FI00580 | Priority number, date | FI19950005268 | 02.11.1995 Original published format: FI 955268 | [1997/46] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716937 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806119 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806119 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
H04B1/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG FÜR INTERFERENZ-GESCHÜTZTE STROMVERSORGUNG | [1997/46] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR INTEFERENCE-PROTECTED POWER SUPPLY | [1997/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION D'ALIMENTATION ELECTRIQUE PROTEGEE CONTRE LES INTERFERENCES | [1997/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1996 | Translation filed | 11.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 12.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2003 | BE | 10.12.2003 | CH | 10.12.2003 | FI | 10.12.2003 | FR | 10.12.2003 | IT | 10.12.2003 | LI | 10.12.2003 | NL | 10.12.2003 | DK | 10.03.2004 | GR | 10.03.2004 | SE | 10.03.2004 | ES | 21.03.2004 | PT | 10.05.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
FR | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 10.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4525863 (STITES FRANCIS H [US]); | [A]EP0596727 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [AP]JPH08204421 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |