Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09127842 | Global Dossier | 16.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09127795 | Global Dossier | 16.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09127794 | Global Dossier | 16.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7338296 | Global Dossier | 22.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | JP9603164 | 29.10.1996 | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1008916 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2003 | B1 | EP1008916 | 14.06.2000 | A4 | EP1008916 | 14.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | JP9603164 | 29.10.1996 | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9611494 | 01.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | JP9603164 | 29.10.1996 | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69629504T | 05.08.2004 | T2 | DE69629504D1 | 18.09.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | JP9603164 | 29.10.1996 | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100270250B | 15.01.2001 | B1 | KR19990067190 | 16.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | JP9603164 | 29.10.1996 | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6029035 | 22.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | JP9603164 | 29.10.1996 | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9716317 | Global Dossier | 09.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1087692C | 17.07.2002 | C | CN1201422 | 09.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28184195 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184295 | 30.10.1995 | JP28184595 | 30.10.1995 |