EP1008916 - ELECTROSTATIC RECORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKICHIKA, Yoshinori Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
KAWATSU, Toshitatsu 6539-1, Yashiro Shimosuwamachi Suwa-gun Nagano 393 / JP | 03 /
TAKASAWA, Kiyotsugu Sankyoshataku 4-2, Yashiro Shimosuwamachi Suwa-gun Nagano 393 / JP | 04 /
KOMATSU, Fumito 1632-12, Hirookanomura Shiojiri-shi Nagano 399-07 / JP | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96935486.9 | 29.10.1996 | [2000/24] | WO1996JP03164 | Priority number, date | JP19950281841 | 30.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28184195 | JP19950281842 | 30.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28184295 | JP19950281845 | 30.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28184595 | [2000/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716317 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008916 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008916 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/11, B41J2/41 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
G03G15/0121 (EP,US);
B41J2/41 (KR);
G03G15/10 (EP,US);
G03G15/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHES AUFNAHMEGERÄT | [2002/09] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC RECORDER | [2000/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION ELECTROSTATIQUE | [2000/24] |
Former [2000/24] | ELEKTROSTATISCHES AUNAHMEGERÄT | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1998 | Translation filed | 13.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 13.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.05.1998 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06194964 ; | [A]US4127082 (KAWABATA NOBUO) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0005366 (GOULD INC [US]) [A] 9,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0026654 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 9,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0092107 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0175392 (ISHIHARA MINING & CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 4; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0226213 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0323615 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4985733 (KUROTORI TSUNEO [JP], et al) [A] 9,10* abstract *; | [A]US5016036 (NISHIKAWA MASAJI [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column 15, lines 37-55; figure 10 *; | [A]EP0578243 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 6, lines 23-58; figures 1,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941018), vol. 018, no. 546, Database accession no. (P - 1814), & JP06194964 A 19940715 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 9,10 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP4503265 ; | [A]JPS4718008 ; | [A]JPS59131951 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JPH04159570 (BROTHER IND LTD) |