Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0802401
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.06.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
27.02.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.01.2003 |
First examination report |
|
11.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.11.2000 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.05.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
05.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.11.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.09.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] |
05.09.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] |
07.08.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|