EP0802401 - TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT METHOD, TEMPERATURE CONTROL METHOD AND TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT APPARATUS FOR HIGH-TEMPERATURE MELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKABE, Susumu Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute 1-297, Kitabukuro-cho Omiya-shi Saitama 330 / JP | 02 /
OGINO, Fumihiko Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute 1-297, Kitabukuro-cho Omiya-shi Saitama 330 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Hideya Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute 1-297, Kitabukuro-cho Omiya-shi Saitama 330 / JP | 04 /
HASEGAWA, Nozomu Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Naoshima Smelter and Refinery 4049-1,Naoshima-cho Kagawa-gun Kagawa 761-31 / JP | 05 /
FUNAMIZU, Takashi NKK Corporation 1-1-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 06 /
YAMADA, Yoshirou NKK Corporation 1-1-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96935514.8 | 31.10.1996 | [1997/43] | WO1996JP03197 | Priority number, date | JP19950309894 | 02.11.1995 Original published format: JP 30989495 | JP19960055876 | 13.03.1996 Original published format: JP 5587696 | JP19960097845 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9784596 | [1997/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716709 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802401 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/08 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
G01J5/08 (EP);
G01J5/0821 (EP,US);
G01J5/004 (EP);
G01J5/0044 (EP);
G01J5/0205 (EP);
G01J5/026 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FI [1997/43] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURMESSVERFAHREN, TEMPERATURKONTROLLVERFAHREN UND TEMPERATURMESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HOCHTEMPERATURSCHMELZE | [1997/43] | English: | TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT METHOD, TEMPERATURE CONTROL METHOD AND TEMPERATURE MEASUREMENT APPARATUS FOR HIGH-TEMPERATURE MELT | [1997/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE DES TEMPERATURES, PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE TEMPERATURE ET EQUIPEMENT DE MESURE POUR MASSE FONDUE A HAUTE TEMPERATURE | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1997 | Translation filed | 17.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 24.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS61288028 ; | [D]JPS60231126 (NORANDA MINES LTD); | [YA]US4619533 (LUCAS JOHN M [CA], et al) [Y] 14-16 * the whole document * [A] 17,18; | [XAY]EP0646778 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,11 * column 2, line 20 - line 50 * * column 5, line 20 - line 40 * * column 7, line 14 - column 8, line 16 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-5,8-10,12,13 [Y] 14-16 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870522), vol. 011, no. 159, Database accession no. (C - 423), & JP61288028 A 19861218 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [DA] 14-16 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6468412 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]JPH0365103U ; | [A]JPH048483B ; | [A]JPH0464419B ; | [A]JPH04335604 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [Y]JPH05248960 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [E]JPH0715040 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JPH0781970 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH07151608 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH07229791 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH07243912 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) |