EP0806092 - A DIRECTIONAL ACOUSTIC SIGNAL PROCESSOR AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interval Research Corporation Building C, 1801 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHADKAMKAR, Neal, Ashok 369 Matadero Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
NGO, John-Thomas, Calderon 719 Liverpool Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Jackson, David Spence, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96935819.1 | 13.09.1996 | [1997/46] | WO1996US14680 | Priority number, date | US19950531143 | 18.09.1995 Original published format: US 531143 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711533 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806092 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/20, H04B15/00, H04M1/00, H04M9/00, H04M9/08 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
G10K11/341 (EP,US);
H04B15/00 (KR);
H04B3/20 (KR);
H04M9/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04M9/082 (EP,US);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
G10K2210/108 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3028 (EP,US);
G10K2210/505 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | RICHTUNGSABHÄNGIGER AKUSTISCHER SIGNALPROZESSOR UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [1997/46] | English: | A DIRECTIONAL ACOUSTIC SIGNAL PROCESSOR AND METHOD THEREFOR | [1997/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX ACOUSTIQUES DIRECTIONNELS ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [1997/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 12.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 17.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5371789 (HIRANO AKIHIRO [JP]); | [X]US4544926 (GIULI DINO [IT]) | [Y] - ICASSP'93, Vol. III, YEHESKEL, "Bar-Ness, Broadband Interference Cancelation Using a Bootstrapped Approach", pages 372-375. | [Y] - FLANAGAN, J.L. et al., Computer-Steered Microphone Arrays for Sound Transduction in Large Rooms, November 1995. |