EP0868119 - CONDITIONALLY MALE-FERTILE PLANTS AND METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR RESTORING THE FERTILITY THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WASHINGTON STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION Northeast 1615 Eastgate Boulevard Pullman, WA 99164-1802 / US | [1998/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWSE, John, Anthony Route 1, Box 39A Palouse, WA 99161 / US | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/41] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96935888.6 | 20.09.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996US15131 | Priority number, date | US19950004214 | 21.09.1995 Original published format: US 4214 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9710703 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868119 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/00, A01N3/00 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
A01N37/42 (EP);
A01H1/026 (EP,US);
A01N37/06 (EP);
A01N61/00 (EP);
C12N15/8243 (EP);
C12N15/8247 (EP);
C12N15/8289 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | PFLANZEN MIT KONDITIONALES MÄNNLICHE FERTILITÄT UND VERFAHREN UND ZUZAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR FRUCHTARKEITSWIEDERHERSTELLUNG | [1998/41] | English: | CONDITIONALLY MALE-FERTILE PLANTS AND METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR RESTORING THE FERTILITY THEREOF | [1998/41] | French: | PLANTES A FECONDITE MALE CONDITIONNELLE ET PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS EN RETABLISSANT LA FECONDITE | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 21.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/45] | 16.06.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4686319 (SHIFRISS OVED [US]); | [Y]US4954158 (STAMMER CHARLES H [US]) | [Y] - PLANT CELL, May 1994, Vol. 6, FEYS et al., "Arabidopsis Mutants Selected for Resistance to the Phytotoxin Coronatine Are Male Sterile, Insensitive to Methyl Jasmonate and Resistant to a Bacterial Pathogen", pages 751-759. | [A] - PLANT BREEDING REVIEWS, 1985, Vol. 3, MICRAE, "Advances in Chemical Hybridization", pages 169-191. | [A] - PHYTOCHEMISTRY, February 1995, Vol. 38, No. 3, KNOFEL et al., "Jasmonates From Pine Pollen", pages 569-571. | by applicant | US4654465 | US4727219 | WO9118512 | WO9318142 | US5356799 | US5432068 | US5436386 |