EP0874734 - METALLIZED FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLIED EXTRUSION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3 Centennial Drive Peabody, MA 01960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states APPLIED EXTRUSION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3 Centennial Drive Peabody, MA 01960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FATICA, Michael, G. 20 Pine Place,Chestnut Valley Newark, DE 19711 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Nand, K. 4 Lynn Hall Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [1999/02] |
Former [1998/45] | 01 /
FATICA, Michael, G. 20 Pine Place,Chestnut Valley Newark, DE 19711 / US | ||
02 /
SINGH, Nand, K. 4 Lynn Hall Newark, DE 19711 / US | Representative(s) | Shaw, Laurence HLBBshaw, 1 Hagley Road Edgebaston Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Shaw, Laurence Laurence Shaw & Associates, 5th Floor Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road Edgbaston, Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 96935968.6 | 26.09.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996US15396 | Priority number, date | US19950534411 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: US 534411 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711846 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874734 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, B65D65/40 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B2307/3065 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2307/7244 (US);
B32B2307/7246 (US);
B32B2311/24 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2553/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | METALLISIERTE FOLIEN | [1998/45] | English: | METALLIZED FILMS | [1998/45] | French: | FILMS METALLISES | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/38] | 14.04.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/38] | Request for further processing for: | 10.02.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 03.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US5326625 (SCHUHMANN DETLEF E ET AL) [DY] 1-3,5-10 * column 2, line 17 - line 60 * * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 38 * * column 8, line 3 - line 9 *; | [DY]US4975315 (BOTHE LOTHAR ET AL) [DY] 1-3,5-10 * column 5, line 14 - line 21; claims 1,5,11,15,17 *; | [DA]US4888237 (BALLONI RICARDO ET AL) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0538747 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 53 - line 56; claim - * |