EP0853789 - FLEXIBLE IMPLEMENTATION OF A SYSTEM MANAGEMENT MODE (SMM) IN A PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAVOR, John, G. 5246 Leesa Ann Court San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 02 /
WEBER, Frederick, D. 1137 Settle Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [1998/30] | Wright, Hugh Ronald Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96935972.8 | 03.10.1996 | [1998/30] | WO1996US15416 | Priority number, date | US19950005069P | 06.10.1995 Original published format: US 5069 P | US19950005021P | 10.10.1995 Original published format: US 5021 P | US19960592149 | 26.01.1996 Original published format: US 592149 | US19960649982 | 16.05.1996 Original published format: US 649982 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713202 | Date: | 10.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0853789 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0853789 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F9/445 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
G06F7/74 (EP,US);
G06F9/30152 (EP,US);
G06F9/30167 (EP,US);
G06F9/30174 (EP,US);
G06F9/30185 (EP,US);
G06F9/3802 (EP,US);
G06F9/3806 (EP,US);
G06F9/3812 (EP,US);
G06F9/3816 (EP,US);
G06F9/382 (EP,US);
G06F9/3822 (EP,US);
G06F9/3824 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (EP,US);
G06F9/3853 (US);
G06F9/3854 (EP,US);
G06F9/3856 (EP,US);
G06F9/445 (EP,US);
G06F9/45533 (EP,US);
G06F9/4812 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1998/30] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES SYSTEMVERWALTUNGSMODUS IN EINEM PROZESSOR | [1998/30] | English: | FLEXIBLE IMPLEMENTATION OF A SYSTEM MANAGEMENT MODE (SMM) IN A PROCESSOR | [1998/30] | French: | MISE EN APPLICATION SOUPLE D'UN MODE DE GESTION DE SYSTEME (SMM) DANS UN PROCESSEUR | [1998/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Request for further processing for: | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | ES | 14.06.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/05] | NL | 03.03.2004 | |
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | ES | 14.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0264216 (AMDAHL CORP [US]); | [Y]GB2259166 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0534597 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [XY]EP0575171 (CYRIX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0651320 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) |