EP0866807 - PORCINE CELL INTERACTION PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALEXION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 25 Science Park Suite 360 New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states ALEXION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 25 Science Park, Suite 360 New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, John, P. 4 Butterwick Lane Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | 02 /
EVANS, Mark, J. 617 Twin Bridge Road Radnor, PA 19087 / US | 03 /
MUELLER, Eileen, Elliott 4 Butterwick Lane Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | 04 /
ROLLINS, Scott 104 Quakers Farm Road Oxford, CT 06478 / US | 05 /
ROTHER, Russell, P. 67 Fernwood Lane Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | 06 /
MATIS, Louis, A. 75 Flintlock Road Southport, CT 06490 / US | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Maschio, Antonio, et al D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1998/40] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96936035.3 | 27.09.1996 | [1998/40] | WO1996US15575 | Priority number, date | US19950004489P | 28.09.1995 Original published format: US 4489 P | US19960721612 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: US 721612 | [1999/25] |
Former [1998/48] | US19950604489 | 28.09.1995 | |
US19960721612 | 26.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/40] | US19950604489 | 28.09.1995 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711971 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0866807 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/46 | [1998/40] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/40] | Title | German: | MIT SCHWEINEZELLEN INTERAGIERENDE PROTEINE | [1998/40] | English: | PORCINE CELL INTERACTION PROTEINS | [1998/40] | French: | PROTEINES D'INTERACTION DE CELLULES PORCINES | [1998/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 25.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - MUELLER JOHN P ET AL, "Porcine vascular cell adhesion molecule (VCAM) mediates endothelial cell adhesion to human T cells.", TRANSPLANTATION (BALTIMORE), (1995), vol. 60, no. 11, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 1299 - 1306, XP002207032 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [Y] - TSANG J. T. M., HASKARD D. O., ROBINSON M. K., "CLONING AND EXPRESSION KINETICS OF PORCINE VASCULAR CELL ADHESION MOLECULE.", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, US, (19940615), vol. 201., no. 02., doi:10.1006/bbrc.1994.1772, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 805 - 812., XP000960483 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1994.1772 | [X] - KUMAGAI-BRAESCH M., ET AL., "IDENTIFICATION OF SWINE AND PRIMATE CELLULAR ADHESION MOLECULES (CAM) USING MOUSE ANTI-HUMAN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES.", Xenotransplantation, Wiley-Blackwell Publishing, Inc., US, US, (19950501), vol. 02., ISSN 0908-665X, pages 88 - 97., XP000961770 |