Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0856194 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2001 | A4 | EP0856194 | 05.08.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9615615 | 27.09.1996 | US53543595 | 28.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9714169 | Global Dossier | 29.05.1997 | A3 | WO9714169 | 17.04.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US53543595 | 28.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5821449 | 13.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US53543595 | 28.09.1995 |