EP0856194 - PROPELLANT GRAIN GEOMETRY FOR CONTROLLING ULLAGE AND INCREASING FLAME PERMEABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC. 600 2nd Street Northeast Hopkins, MN 55343-8384 / US | [1998/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGSJOEN, Peter, L. 1446 Kentucky Avenue South St. Louis Park, MN 55426 / US | 02 /
SPECK, James, A. 1442 Glenview Drive Waterford, MI 48327 / US | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/32] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96936059.3 | 27.09.1996 | [1998/32] | WO1996US15615 | Priority number, date | US19950535435 | 28.09.1995 Original published format: US 535435 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9714169 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0856194 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F42B5/16 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
C06B45/00 (EP,US);
F42B5/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/32] | H01J17/48, H02H1/00, H02H1/04, H02H3/22, H02H9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/32] | Title | German: | GEOMETRIE EINES FESTSTOFFBRENNSATZES ZUR VERMINDERUNG DES RESTVOLUMENS UND ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES ABBRANDS | [1998/32] | English: | PROPELLANT GRAIN GEOMETRY FOR CONTROLLING ULLAGE AND INCREASING FLAME PERMEABILITY | [1998/32] | French: | GEOMETRIE DES BLOCS DE POUDRE PROPULSIVE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LE VOLUME RESIDUEL ET D'ACCROITRE LA PERMEABILITE A LA FLAMME | [1998/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 27.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 01.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/47] | 14.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9425414 (ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1* page 12, lines 1--11; figures 4B,4E * | International search | [X]US1074809 (NEWTON CHARLES [US]); | [X]US1077320 (WALSH JAMES L [US]); | [A]US3105350 (EICHENBERGER HANS P); | [A]US3418811 (CAVENY LEONARD H, et al); | [A]US3429264 (OVERSOHL WILHELM, et al); | [A]US3931765 (PORTALIER PIERRE LOUIS); | [A]US4094248 (JACOBSON SIDNEY S); | [Y]US4386569 (DEAS ROBERT W); | [A]US4627352 (BRACHERT HEINRICH [DE], et al); | [X]US4846368 (GOETZ GEORGE W [US]); | [A]US5251549 (BOISSEAU JEAN [FR], et al) |