EP0880856 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING TELEVISION SCHEDULE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starsight Telecast, Inc. 6922 Hollywood Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90028 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states STARSIGHT TELECAST, INC. 6922 Hollywood Boulevard Los Angeles California 90028 / US | ||
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states STARSIGHT TELECAST, INC. 39650 Liberty Street, Third Floor Fremont, CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEIN, Steven, Michael 1326 Hoover Street 10 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
O'BRIEN, Sean, Andrew 15103 Haverfield Court Cypress, TX 77429 / US | 03 /
KLOSTERMAN, Brian, Lee 310 Rio Grande Place San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 04 /
MILNES, Kenneth, Alan 35815 Hibiscus Court Fremont, CA 94536 / US | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96936153.4 | 02.10.1996 | [1998/49] | WO1996US15859 | Priority number, date | US19950537650 | 02.10.1995 Original published format: US 537650 | US19960642259 | 03.05.1996 Original published format: US 642259 | US19960022826P | 26.07.1996 Original published format: US 22826 P | [2005/22] |
Former [2004/17] | US19950537650 | 02.10.1995 | |
US19960642259 | 03.05.1996 | ||
US19960022826P | 27.07.1996 | ||
Former [1998/49] | US19950537650 | 02.10.1995 | |
US19960642259 | 03.05.1996 | ||
US19960022826P | 26.07.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713368 | Date: | 10.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880856 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880856 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0880856 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/10, H04N5/76, H04N7/16 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
H04N7/17318 (EP);
H04N7/10 (KR);
H04N21/44224 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP);
H04N21/25891 (EP);
H04N21/262 (EP);
H04N21/26283 (EP);
H04N21/4113 (EP);
H04N21/4135 (EP);
H04N21/4312 (EP);
H04N21/4314 (EP);
H04N21/4345 (EP);
H04N21/43615 (EP);
H04N21/4524 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/458 (EP);
H04N21/4622 (EP);
H04N21/4668 (EP);
H04N21/47202 (EP);
H04N21/47214 (EP);
H04N21/4722 (EP);
H04N21/4753 (EP);
H04N21/4755 (EP);
H04N21/478 (EP);
H04N21/4782 (EP);
H04N21/482 (EP);
H04N21/4828 (EP);
H04N21/812 (EP);
H04N21/816 (EP);
H04N21/84 (EP);
H04N21/858 (EP);
H04N21/8586 (EP);
H04N5/782 (EP);
H04N7/08 (EP);
H04N7/165 (EP);
H04N7/173 (EP);
H04N21/42204 (EP);
H04N21/4316 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/49] | H04N7/10, H04N5/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/49] | Extension states | AL | 01.05.1998 | LT | 01.05.1998 | LV | 01.05.1998 | SI | 01.05.1998 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON FERNSEHPROGRAMMINFORMATION | [1998/49] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING TELEVISION SCHEDULE INFORMATION | [1998/49] | French: | SYSTEMES D'INFORMATION SUR LES PROGRAMMES DE TELEVISION ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS | [1998/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 01.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 01.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05075464.7 / EP1542464 | EP05077729.1 / EP1667445 | EP08103061.1 / EP1986430 | EP08103069.4 / EP1968314 | EP08161654.2 / EP1988711 | EP10179159.8 / EP2385702 | EP10179274.5 / EP2369838 | EP10179285.1 / EP2282539 | EP10179299.2 / EP2282540 | EP10179306.5 / EP2282541 | EP10179314.9 / EP2282542 | EP10179566.4 / EP2288149 | EP10179577.1 / EP2288150 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.12.2005
13.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, et al, et al Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.12.2005
13.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, et al, et al Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.12.2005
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, et al, et al Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [2006/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2005
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V. (IGR e.V.) Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 17.01.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.07.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.07.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.07.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/49] | Request for further processing for: | 09.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2005 | BE | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | IE | 03.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5353121 (YOUNG PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 10 *; | [XA]WO9501059 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * page 6, line 10 - page 8, line 2 * * page 48, line 1 - page 49, line 3 * * page 66, line 1 - page 67, line 6 * [A] 4,8; | [X]WO9510910 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 4,10 * page 2, line 1 - line 7 * * page 5, line 1 - line 10 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 18 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 5 *; | [A] - ROGERS C, "TELCOS VS. CABLE TV: THE GLOBAL VIEW WITH MARKETS CONVERGING AND REGULATORY BARRIERS FALLING, SERVICE CARRIERS ARE READY TO RUMBLE", DATA COMMUNICATIONS, (19950921), vol. 24, no. 13, page 75/76, 78, 80, XP000526196 [A] 4 * page 76, column R, paragraph 3 - page 78, column L, paragraph 1 * | International search | [XP]US5479266 (YOUNG PATRICK [US], et al); | [YP]US5550576 (KLOSTERMAN BRIAN L [US]); | [YP]US5559548 (DAVIS BRUCE [US], et al) |