EP0855910 - CONJUGATES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF BENIGN PROSTATIC HYPERPLASIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeFEO-JONES, Deborah 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
JONES, Raymond, E. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
OLIFF, Allen, I. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 04 /
SCOLNICK, Edward, M. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 05 /
GARSKY, Victor, M. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1998/32] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96936504.8 | 15.10.1996 | [1998/32] | WO1996US16490 | Priority number, date | US19950005664P | 18.10.1995 Original published format: US 5664 P | GB19960002903 | 13.02.1996 Original published format: GB 9602903 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714416 | Date: | 24.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855910 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/40, A61K31/44, A61K31/70, A61K38/02, A61K38/07, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, A61K38/14, A61K47/48 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61K47/65 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/32] | A61K31/40, A61K31/44, A61K31/70, A61K38/02, A61K38/07, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, A61K38/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/32] | Title | German: | VERWENDBARE KONJUGATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER GUTARTIGEN PROSTATEHYPERPLASIE | [1998/32] | English: | CONJUGATES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF BENIGN PROSTATIC HYPERPLASIA | [1998/32] | French: | CONJUGUES UTILES POUR TRAITER L'ADENOME PROSTATIQUE BENIN | [1998/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 18.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 04.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/44] | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0247792 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] * page 11 - page 12; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9210212 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]) [A] * page 4 - page 6 *; | [A]EP0282057 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US]) [A] * column 2, line 36 - line 53; examples 2,4,7 *; | [A] - LILJA ET AL., "Molecular cloning of epididymal and seminal vesicular transcripts encoding a semenogelin-related protein", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (199205), vol. 89, pages 4559 - 4563, XP002137094 [A] * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.10.4559 | [A] - TESSMER ET AL., "Biological activity of prostate-specific antigen isolated...", ELECTROPHORESIS, (199505), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 793 - 799, XP000901881 [A] * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.11501601130 | International search | [AP]US5501983 (LILJA HANS [SE], et al); | [AP]US5502037 (KONDRATYEV ALEXI [US]); | [XP]WO9600503 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [A]US5349066 (KANEKO TAKUSHI [US], et al); | [A]US5391723 (PRIEST JOHN H [US]) |