25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
21.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
31.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] |
24.10.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
08.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
25.07.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] |
06.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] |
01.11.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
29.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.06.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
26.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.05.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.11.2000 |
First examination report |
|
23.11.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.05.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
19.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
17.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|