Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3950942B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2007 | B2 | JP2000513826 | 17.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | US9616943 | 23.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7467796 | Global Dossier | 14.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | US9616943 | 23.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1015938 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2002 | B1 | EP1015938 | 05.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | US9616943 | 23.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE230125T | 15.01.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | US9616943 | 23.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2257224 | 31.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | US9616943 | 23.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69625527T | 06.11.2003 | T2 | DE69625527D1 | 30.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | US9616943 | 23.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5976698 | 02.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | US93623997 | 24.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9750016 | Global Dossier | 31.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100405224B | 05.02.2004 | B1 | KR20000022129 | 25.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY121675 | 28.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW531682B | 11.05.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5710097 | 20.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US67128396 | 27.06.1996 |