EP1015938 - PROCESS AND MATERIALS FOR IMAGEWISE PLACEMENT OF UNIFORM SPACERS IN FLAT PANEL DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARAL, John, S. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
JALBERT, Claire, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
TOLBERT, William, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
WOLK, Martin, B. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
MARTENS, Allan, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
ISBERG, Thomas, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96936858.8 | 23.10.1996 | [2000/27] | WO1996US16943 | Priority number, date | US19960671283 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: US 671283 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9750016 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015938 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015938 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1339, B41M5/40 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
G02F1/1339 (KR);
B41M5/38207 (EP,US);
B41M5/46 (EP,US);
G02F1/13394 (EP,US);
B41M5/392 (EP,US);
B41M5/395 (EP,US);
B41M5/41 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2817 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN ZÜR BILDWEISEN ANORDNUNG VON GLEICHMASSIGEN ABSTANDSHALTERN IN FLACHBILDSCHIRMEN | [2002/33] | English: | PROCESS AND MATERIALS FOR IMAGEWISE PLACEMENT OF UNIFORM SPACERS IN FLAT PANEL DISPLAYS | [2000/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET MATERIAUX POUR LA MISE EN PLACE SOUS FORME D'IMAGES DE SEPARATEURS UNIFORMES DANS DES AFFICHAGES A PANNEAUX PLAT | [2000/27] |
Former [2000/27] | VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN FÜR DIE BILDMÄSSIGE ANORDNUNG UNIFORMER ABSTANDSHALTER FÜR FLACHBILDSCHIRME | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.1998 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.12.2002 | BE | 18.12.2002 | CH | 18.12.2002 | FR | 18.12.2002 | IT | 18.12.2002 | LI | 18.12.2002 | NL | 18.12.2002 | DK | 18.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
FR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 18.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0163297 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 10 * page 5, line 01 - page 6, line 24 ** page 31, line 03 - page 37, line 09; figures 8,14 *; | [A]US4983429 (TAKAYANAGI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 30 *; | [A]JPH07152038 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |