Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002522008 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU715267B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2000 | B2 | AU7486596 | 29.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | AU7486596 | 08.11.1996 | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0859936 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2002 | B1 | EP0859936 | 25.08.1999 | A4 | EP0859936 | 26.08.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE222342T | 15.08.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2271789 | 15.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69623034T | 08.05.2003 | T2 | DE69623034D1 | 19.09.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0859936T | 16.12.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1018966 | 14.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ321517 | 29.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6405663 | 18.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | AU9600716 | 08.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9717573 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1167897C | 22.09.2004 | C | CN1211309 | 17.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2181918T | 01.03.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100443472B | 15.10.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW409078B | 21.10.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | AUPN644895 | 08.11.1995 |