EP0859936 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WASTE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plas Ltd. P.O. Box 3443, Tropic Isle Building Road Town Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Plas Ltd. P.O. Box 3443, Tropic Isle Building Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states MILTOX HOLDINGS PTE. LTD. 5 Temasek Blvd. No. 06-05, Suntec City Tower 5 Singapore 038985 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Ian 3 Falcon Avenue Thornlands, QLD 4164 / AU | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Maschio, Antonio D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96937132.7 | 08.11.1996 | [1998/35] | WO1996AU00716 | Priority number, date | AU1995PN06448 | 08.11.1995 Original published format: AU PN644895 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9717573 | Date: | 15.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859936 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0859936 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/20, F23G5/02, F27B7/00 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
F23J15/006 (EP,US);
F23G5/008 (EP,US);
F23G5/02 (EP,US);
F23G5/20 (EP,US);
F23G2206/203 (EP,US);
F23G2209/102 (EP,US);
F23G2209/12 (EP,US);
F23G2900/50206 (EP,US);
F23J2215/20 (EP,US);
F23J2215/30 (EP,US);
F23J2215/60 (EP,US);
F23J2217/101 (EP,US);
F23J2217/40 (EP,US);
F23J2219/30 (EP,US);
F23J2219/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABFALLBEHANDLUNG | [1998/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WASTE TREATMENT | [1998/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DES DECHETS | [1998/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 04.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.08.2002 | BE | 14.08.2002 | CH | 14.08.2002 | LI | 14.08.2002 | NL | 14.08.2002 | LU | 08.11.2002 | PT | 29.11.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/48] | AT | 14.08.2002 | |
BE | 14.08.2002 | ||
CH | 14.08.2002 | ||
LI | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
PT | 29.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 14.08.2002 | |
CH | 14.08.2002 | ||
LI | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
PT | 29.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | NL | 14.08.2002 | |
PT | 29.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 14.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]WO9012251 (MILNER WILLIAM ROLAND [AU]) [DY] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-10; | [A]WO9417332 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 2 ** figure 1 *; | [YA]WO9514885 (AUVINEN KYOESTI [FI], et al) [Y] 15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * figure 1; claim 8 * [A] 9 | International search | [Y]US3827379 (TSURUTA H, et al); | [Y]EP0084168 (TECNITALIA SPA [IT]); | [Y]US4640203 (WOLTER ALBRECHT [DE], et al); | [Y]WO8802284 (NEUTRALYSIS IND PTY LTD [AU]); | [Y]WO9012251 (MILNER WILLIAM ROLAND [AU]); | US4993331 [ ] (WHITE KENNETH L [AU], et al); | [X]US5057009 (NECHVATAL TIMOTHY M [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9012251 |