EP0874894 - A PERACID BASED DISHWASHING DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diversey IP International BV World Headquarters Tower B, 8th floor Schipol Boulevard 209 1118 BH Luchthaven Schipol Airport / NL | [2003/06] |
Former [1998/45] | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICHOLSON, John, Richard Unilever Research U.S., Inc., 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 02 /
SECEMSKI, Isaac, Israel Unilever Research U.S., Inc., 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 03 /
RICK, Deboral, Sue Unilever Research U.S., Inc., 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 04 /
RAIBLE, Duane, Anthony Unilever Research U.S., Inc., 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/42] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | Boerma, Caroline, et al Unilever N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1998/45] | Tansley, Sally Elizabeth Unilever PLC, Patent Division, Colworth House Sharbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96937247.3 | 23.10.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996EP04659 | Priority number, date | US19950558994 | 16.11.1995 Original published format: US 558994 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718287 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874894 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874894 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C11D3/39 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP,US);
C11D3/3945 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/45] | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMITTEL AUF BASIS VON PERSÄURE | [1998/45] | English: | A PERACID BASED DISHWASHING DETERGENT COMPOSITION | [1998/45] | French: | COMPOSITION DETERGENTE DE LAVAGE DE LA VAISSELLE A BASE DE PERACIDE | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 04.04.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.06.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.10.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.11.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.11.2005 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/14] | Appeal following opposition | 24.12.2003 | Appeal received No. T0016/04 | 19.02.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.11.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 23.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2005 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0135226 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,5,15 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 9; claim - *; | [PA]EP0684304 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PA] 1,2,5-8,11,12,15 * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 2; example -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9402597 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1,5,6 * claim - * |