EP0857154 - DEVICE FOR CONVEYING SHEETS IN A PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMPERA, Christian Am Schafbach 6 D-69250 Schönau / DE | 02 /
METZLER, Patrick Völklinger Strasse 17 D-66606 St. Wendel / DE | 03 /
RODI, Anton Karlsruher Strasse 12 D-69181 Leimen / DE | 04 /
SCHÖNFELD, Carsten Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 1 D-68799 Reilingen / DE | 05 /
SCHULZ, Peter Glanstrasse 2 D-66909 Matzenbach / DE | 06 /
WEISS, Paul Hauptstrasse 24 D-66851 Queidersbach / DE | [1998/33] | Application number, filing date | 96937263.0 | 28.10.1996 | [1998/33] | WO1996EP04677 | Priority number, date | DE1995140210 | 28.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19540210 | DE1996143106 | 21.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19643106 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716366 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857154 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857154 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/02, B65H29/16, B41F21/00, // H02N13/00 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
H02N13/00 (EP,US);
B65H5/02 (KR);
B41F21/00 (EP,US);
B65H5/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1998/33] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN VON BOGEN IN EINER DRUCKTECHNISCHEN MASCHINE | [1998/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONVEYING SHEETS IN A PRINTING MACHINE | [1998/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ACHEMINER DES FEUILLES DANS UNE MACHINE A IMPRIMER | [1998/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2232147 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-7; | [A]US5255904 (TAGUCHI KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al)[A] 1-7; | [A]US5382014 (FUKUBE NORIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-7 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1-7 |