EP0858545 - DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albany Door Systems AB Box 509 S-301 80 Halmstad / SE | [2002/48] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states NOMAFA AB Box 509 S-301 80 Halmstad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AABEL, Lasse Trostevn. 20 N-3030 Drammen / NO | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Giver, Sören Bo, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Giver, Sören Bo, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 96937592.2 | 25.10.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996NO00252 | Priority number, date | NO19950004297 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: NO 954297 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9715745 | Date: | 01.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858545 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/56 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
E06B9/0692 (EP,KR);
E06B9/063 (EP,KR);
E06B9/0653 (EP,KR);
E06B9/62 (EP,KR);
E06B2009/135 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Title | German: | TÜR | [1998/34] | English: | DOOR | [1998/34] | French: | PORTE | [1998/34] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 25.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 29.05.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/23] | 08.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DK127859B (ABERG M); | [Y]US4858668 (TOTI ANDREW J [US]); | [Y]SE386944 (NORDISKA MASKINFILT AB [SE]); | [A]US5301732 (AABEL LASSE [NO]); | [A]SE364548 (JAKOBSSON H); | [A]SE441290 (UTEC PORTEN AB [SE]); | [A]NO156876B (MOCK AB OY [FI]) |