EP0858409 - YIELDABLE TACKLE FOR TENSION ELEMENTS SUCH AS CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ewes Stalfjäder AB Lundavägen 45 330 10 Bredaryd / SE | [1998/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERMAN, Karl-Gustaf Pl. 4325 S-440 33 Harestad / SE | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | Application number, filing date | 96937620.1 | 29.10.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996SE01386 | Priority number, date | SE19950003849 | 01.11.1995 Original published format: SE 9503849 | [1998/34] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716340 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858409 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858409 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/00, F16G11/12 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
B63B21/04 (EP,US);
F16G11/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT [1998/34] | Title | German: | ELASTISCHE TAKELUNG FÜR ZUGELEMENTE, INSBESONDERE FÜR SEILE | [1998/34] | English: | YIELDABLE TACKLE FOR TENSION ELEMENTS SUCH AS CABLES | [1998/34] | French: | MOYENS ELASTIQUES DE HALAGE POUR ELEMENTS DE TENSION, TELS QUE DES CABLES | [1998/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1997 | Translation filed | 02.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 11.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.09.2001 | FI | 19.09.2001 | IT | 19.09.2001 | NL | 19.09.2001 | IE | 29.10.2001 | DK | 19.12.2001 | GB | 19.12.2001 | PT | 19.12.2001 | GR | 21.12.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/01] | BE | 19.09.2001 | |
FI | 19.09.2001 | ||
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
IE | 29.10.2001 | ||
DK | 19.12.2001 | ||
GB | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2004/42] | BE | 19.09.2001 | |
FI | 19.09.2001 | ||
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
IE | 29.10.2001 | ||
DK | 19.12.2001 | ||
GB | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | BE | 19.09.2001 | |
FI | 19.09.2001 | ||
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
DK | 19.12.2001 | ||
GB | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | BE | 19.09.2001 | |
FI | 19.09.2001 | ||
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
GB | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | BE | 19.09.2001 | |
FI | 19.09.2001 | ||
GB | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | BE | 19.09.2001 | |
FI | 19.09.2001 | ||
PT | 19.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | FI | 19.09.2001 | |
PT | 19.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 19.09.2001 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0255281 (SKYBA HELMUT K); | [Y]US4864956 (ONSTWEDDER JR JOHN [US]); | [A]US5307753 (BESONEN SR PAUL W [US], et al); | [A]US1385919 (WILLIAM IRWIN); | [A]DE3112050 |