EP0861241 - ACYLATED 5-AMINOISOTHIAZOLES WITH INSECTICIDAL PROPERTIES, INTERMEDIATE PRODUCTS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIL, Markus Am Benthal 54 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
ERDELEN, Christoph Unterbüscherhof 15 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 03 /
WACHENDORFF-NEUMANN, Ulrike Oberer Markenweg 85 D-56566 Neuwied / DE | 04 /
TURBERG, Andreas Naheweg 19 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 05 /
MENCKE, Norbert Grundermühle 2 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/36] | Application number, filing date | 96938067.4 | 04.11.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996EP04796 | Priority number, date | DE1995142372 | 14.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19542372 | [1998/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718198 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861241 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861241 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D275/03, A01N43/80, C07C233/91 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
C07D275/03 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/80 (EP,KR,US);
C07C233/91 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/36] | Title | German: | ACYLIERTE 5-AMINOISOTHIAZOLE MIT INSEKTIZIDER WIRKUNG, ZWISCHENPRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/36] | English: | ACYLATED 5-AMINOISOTHIAZOLES WITH INSECTICIDAL PROPERTIES, INTERMEDIATE PRODUCTS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM | [1998/36] | French: | 5-AMINOISOTHIAZOLES ACYLES AVEC EFFET INSECTICIDE, PRODUITS INTERMEDIAIRES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.11.2004 | ES | 05.11.2004 | BE | 30.11.2004 | CH | 30.11.2004 | LI | 30.11.2004 | [2006/50] |
Former [2006/13] | GB | 04.11.2004 | |
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | GB | 04.11.2004 | |
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 30.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2014527 (MERCK AG E) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * column W *; | [Y]EP0334809 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * column W *; | [DY]EP0623282 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DY] 1-5,7-11 * column W *; | [X]EP0640597 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * column W *; | [PX]WO9531448 (DOWELANCO [US], et al) [PX] 1-5,7-11 * column W *; | [Y] - GOERDELER,J. ET AL., "Darstellung und Cyclisierung von alpha-Acyl-beta- amino-thiocrotonamiden", CHEM.BER., WEINHEIM, (196302), vol. 96, pages 526 - 533, XP000651464 [Y] 6 * column W * | [Y] - GOERDELER,J. ET AL., "Synthese von 5-Amino-3-hydroxy(alkoxy-,amino-)isothiazolen und von Derivaten der Pyrimidinthione-(4)", CHEM.BER., WEINHEIM, (196410), vol. 97, pages 3106 - 3117, XP000651463 [Y] 6 * column W * | [Y] - RAJAPPA,S. ET AL., "Synthesis of Thiophenes : Part VI - Synthesis of 2-Nitro- & 2,4-Dinitrothiophenes by direct Ring-closure Reactions", INDIAN J.CHEM., (197809), vol. 16B, pages 752 - 754, XP002026306 [Y] 6 * column W * | [Y] - HOWE,R.K., "Reaction of Ethyl-beta-Aminocrotonate with Trichloromethanesulfenyl Chloride", J.ORG.CHEM., WASHINGTON, (1977), vol. 42, no. 20, pages 3230 - 3233, XP000651467 [Y] 6 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00440a005 |