EP0859816 - ELECTRICALLY DEPOSITED COATING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states BASF Coatings Aktiengesellschaft Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜCKEN, Thomas Grüner Weg 7 b D-48167 Münster / DE | 02 /
OTT, Günther Von-Holte-Strasse 101a D-48167 Münster / DE | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Fitzner, Uwe, et al Fitzner & Frese PartGmbB Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Fitzner, Uwe, Dr., et al Dres. Fitzner & Christophersen, Rechts- und Patentanwälte, Kaiserswerther Str. 74 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96938103.7 | 06.11.1996 | [1998/35] | WO1996EP04835 | Priority number, date | DE1995141230 | 06.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19541230 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9717408 | Date: | 15.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859816 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0859816 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/44 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
C09D5/4492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/35] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH ABSCHEIDBARES ÜBERZUGSMITTEL | [1998/35] | English: | ELECTRICALLY DEPOSITED COATING AGENT | [1998/35] | French: | AGENT DE REVETEMENT POUVANT ETRE DEPOSE PAR VOIE ELECTRIQUE | [1998/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 08.05.2002 | SE | 08.08.2002 | AT | 06.11.2002 | BE | 30.11.2002 | CH | 30.11.2002 | LI | 30.11.2002 | [2004/14] |
Former [2004/10] | NL | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CH | 30.11.2002 | ||
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/40] | NL | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
CH | 30.11.2002 | ||
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 08.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US3640926 (SLATER WILLIAM W, et al) [DX] 1,2,6,8,10 * column 1, lines 26-34 * * column 1, lines 47-56 * * column 2, lines 48-54 * * column 3, lines 60-61 *; | [A]EP0059468 (BASF FARBEN & FASERN [DE]) [A] 1,10* abstract * |