EP0800440 - DEVICE FOR THE DOSING OF GRANULAR, POURABLE MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR BLASTING SHOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEINRICH SCHLICK GmbH Grevener Landstrasse 22-24 D-48268 Greven / DE | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUHOLL, Heinz Nordwalder Strasse 125 D-48282 Emsdetten / DE | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 96938116.9 | 06.11.1996 | [1997/42] | WO1996EP04851 | Priority number, date | DE1995141228 | 06.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19541228 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9717169 | Date: | 15.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800440 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800440 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B24C7/00 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
B24C7/0053 (EP,US);
B24C7/00 (KR);
B24C5/04 (EP,US);
B24C7/0046 (EP,US);
B24C7/0061 (EP,US);
B24C7/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM DOSIEREN VON KÖRNIGEN, RIESELFÄHIGEN MATERIALIEN, INSBESONDERE STRAHLMITTEL | [1997/42] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE DOSING OF GRANULAR, POURABLE MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR BLASTING SHOTS | [1997/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DOSER DES MATERIAUX GRANULEUX COULANTS, NOTAMMENT DES GRENAILLES | [1997/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 25.07.2001 | IE | 25.07.2001 | DK | 25.10.2001 | GR | 26.10.2001 | LU | 30.11.2001 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/51] | FI | 25.07.2001 | |
IE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DK | 25.10.2001 | ||
GR | 26.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 25.07.2001 | |
IE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DK | 25.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 25.07.2001 | |
IE | 25.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 25.07.2001 | Cited in | International search | [DY]US2365250 (CROWLEY THOMAS C) [DY] 1,4,6,12,13 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2520566 (ADOLPH SARGROVE JOHN) [A] 10 * column 5, paragraph L; figure 4 *; | [A]GB1011822 (SMIDTH & CO AS F L) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3131002 (CAFTANAT SERGIU DIPL ING) [A] 8 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2146807 (BIR PLC); | [DA]GB2182628 (METAL IMPROVEMENT CO) [DA] 3,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0407197 (LYNN WILLIAM R [US]); | [DYA]EP0578132 (SCHLICK HEINRICH GMBH CO KG [DE]) [DY] 1,4,6,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 7,14 |