EP0868428 - PHOSPHONIC ACID DERIVATIVES WITH METALLOPEPTIDASE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAMBON GROUP S.p.A. Via della Chimica, 9 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2003/12] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states ZAMBON GROUP S.p.A. Via della Chimica, 9 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORCINI, Gabriele Via A. Volta, 42 I-21010 Vizzola Ticino / IT | 02 /
BOTTA, Daniela Via Valleggio, 4 I-22100 Como / IT | 03 /
SANTANGELO, Francesco Via Don Gnocchi, 33 I-20148 Milano / IT | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Panossian, Stefano Zambon Group S.p.A Industrial Property & Intelligence Director Via Lillo del Duca, 10 20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Panossian, Stefano Zambon Group S.p.A, Industrial Property & Intelligence Director, Via Lillo del Duca, 10 20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1998/41] | Longoni, Alessandra c/o Zambon Group S.p.A., Corp. Patent & Trademark Dept., Via Lillo del Duca 10 20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT | Application number, filing date | 96938164.9 | 11.11.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996EP04911 | Priority number, date | IT1995MI02430 | 23.11.1995 Original published format: IT MI952430 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719102 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868428 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868428 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/062, C07K5/065, A61K38/05 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
C07K5/06191 (EP,US);
C07K5/06017 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/41] | Extension states | SI | 30.04.1998 | Title | German: | PHOSPHONSÄUREDERIVATE MIT METALLOPEPTIDASE INHIBIERENDER AKTIVITÄT | [1998/41] | English: | PHOSPHONIC ACID DERIVATIVES WITH METALLOPEPTIDASE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY | [1998/41] | French: | DERIVES DE L'ACIDE PHOSPHONIQUE POSSEDANT UNE ACTIVITE D'INHIBITION DES METALLOPEPTIDASES | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 17.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 19.03.2003 | LU | 30.11.2003 | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/17] | LU | 30.11.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4432972 (KARANEWSKY DONALD S [US], et al) [DX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9528417 (ZAMBON SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [PX] - P.J.KUKKOLA E.A, "Differential structure-activity relationships of phospgoramidon analogues for inhibition of three metalloproteases: ECE, NEP and ACE", J.CARDIOVASC.PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 26, no. suppl.3, pages s65 - s68, XP000647537 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1995), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 145 - 150 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1994), vol. 4, no. 22, pages 2715 - 2720 |