EP0820387 - MAILING SYSTEM CONTROLLED BY COMPUTER SOFTWARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, IT, LI | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prinserter Corporation Sandringham House, 83 Shirley Street Nassau, New Providence / BS | For all designated states Ishikawa, Yuji Osterather Strasse 6 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [1998/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Yuji Osterather Strasse 6 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SCHMITZ, Heinz, Prinserter Corporation Sandringham House, 83 Shirley Street Nassau, New Providence / BS | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/18] |
Former [1998/20] | Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/05] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96938524.4 | 21.11.1996 | [1998/05] | WO1996JP03422 | Priority number, date | JP19960059955 | 08.02.1996 Original published format: JP 5995596 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728972 | Date: | 14.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820387 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820387 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B43M5/04 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
B43M5/042 (EP,US);
B43M5/04 (KR);
B65H2801/06 (EP,US);
B65H2801/27 (EP,US);
B65H2801/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/05] | Title | German: | COMPUTER SOFTWARE GESTEUERTES POSTSYSTEM | [1998/05] | English: | MAILING SYSTEM CONTROLLED BY COMPUTER SOFTWARE | [1998/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE POST-TRAITEMENT, ET SON PROCEDE DE COMMANDE | [1998/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 07.04.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Public notification(s) | decision dated 04.07.2007; dispatch date 12.07.2007; Prinserter Corporation; Sandringham House, 83 Shirley Street; Nassau; New Providence; BAHAMAS | Prinserter Corporation Sandringham House, 83 Shirley Street Nassau, New Providence / BS | [2007/46] | Undeliverable Mail, addressee unknown | Prinserter Corporation Sandringham House, 83 Shirley Street Nassau, New Providence / BS | [2006/41] | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2002
13.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Weinmiller, Jürgen Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | 02
25.04.2002
13.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE Pitney Bowes, Inc. World Headquarters, One Elmcroft Rd. Stamford/ Connecticut 06926 0700 / US Opponent's representative Avery, Stephen John Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2002
13.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Weinmiller, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. SPOTT & WEINMILLER Lennéstrasse 9 82340 Feldafing / DE | ||
02
25.04.2002
13.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE Pitney Bowes, Inc. World Headquarters, One Elmcroft Rd. Stamford/ Connecticut 06926 0700 / US Opponent's representative Avery, Stephen John Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2002/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Weinmiller, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. SPOTT & WEINMILLER Lennéstrasse 9 82340 Feldafing / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 04.06.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.12.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.06.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.07.2005 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.07.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/34] | Appeal following opposition | 07.09.2005 | Appeal received No. T1159/05 | 25.10.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.07.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2001 | BE | 25.07.2001 | CH | 25.07.2001 | FI | 25.07.2001 | IT | 25.07.2001 | LI | 25.07.2001 | NL | 25.07.2001 | DK | 25.10.2001 | PT | 25.10.2001 | SE | 25.10.2001 | GB | 21.11.2001 | IE | 21.11.2001 | LU | 21.11.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | DE | 02.07.2002 | FR | 31.12.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/42] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
DK | 25.10.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
IE | 21.11.2001 | ||
LU | 21.11.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
FR | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
DK | 25.10.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
LU | 21.11.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
FR | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
DK | 25.10.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
FR | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
DK | 25.10.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
DK | 25.10.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/32] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
DE | 02.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
FI | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 25.10.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1234069 (TELEFUNKEN PATENT, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,6,9 *; | [A]FR2308990 (AFFRANCHISSEMENT TIMBRAGE AUTO [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2940771 (SEBALD U E [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 10 - page 14, line 16 *; | [XA]EP0265192 (LASER IMPRESSIONS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3 * page 4, line 3 - line 56 * [A] 2,4; | [A]GB2219575 (PITNEY BOWES PLC [GB]) [A] 12-15 * page 6, line 17 - page 16, line 10 *; | [X]EP0406976 (HADEWE BV [NL]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 19 - column 10, line 40 *; | [XA]EP0447180 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 4, line 55 - page 7, line 9 * * page 14, line 56 - page 15, line 33 * [A] 11,12; | [A]EP0540292 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1,27 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 27 * * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 33 *; | [AP]EP0719597 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [AP] 1* abstract * |