EP0861292 - CROSSLINKABLE HYDROXY FUNCTIONAL POLYDIENE POLYMER COATING COMPOSTIONS AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ST. CLAIR, David, John 13831 Queensbury Houston, TX 77079 / US | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J., et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Zeestraten, Albertus Wilhelmus Joannes, et al Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 96939053.3 | 12.11.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996EP05023 | Priority number, date | US19950006816P | 16.11.1995 Original published format: US 6816 P | US19960028378P | 15.10.1996 Original published format: US 28378 P | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718264 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861292 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861292 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L19/00, C08L19/02 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
C08L19/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L19/00 (KR);
B05D7/57 (EP,US);
C08K5/13 (KR);
C08L19/006 (EP,US);
C09D119/006 (EP,US);
C09D123/18 (KR);
C08K5/053 (EP,US);
C08L61/24 (EP,US);
C08L61/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L19/006, C08L2666/16 (EP,US);
C09D119/006, C08L2666/16 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/36] | Title | German: | VERNETZBARE ÜBERZUGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON HYDROXYFUNKTIONELLEN DIENPOLYMEREN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/36] | English: | CROSSLINKABLE HYDROXY FUNCTIONAL POLYDIENE POLYMER COATING COMPOSTIONS AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING THEM | [1998/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT A BASE DE POLYMERE DE POLYDIENE RETICULABLE A FONCTIONNALITE HYDROXY, ET LEUR PROCEDE D'ELABORATION | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2270317 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] * example 48; claims 7,19 *; | [PA]US5500481 (ST CLAIR DAVID J [US]) [PA] * claim - *; | [PA]EP0698638 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [PA] * claim 1 * | Examination | WO9611215 |