EP0874810 - METHOD FOR PURIFYING DIMETHYL SULPHOXIDE (DMSO) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF AQUITAINE PRODUCTION Tour Elf 2 Place de la Coupole La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states ELF AQUITAINE PRODUCTION Tour Elf 2 Place de la Coupole La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMMARIEU, Annie 3, rue Molière F-92400 Coubevoie / FR | 02 /
BAZIN, Isabelle Chemin du Berdoulou F-64290 Gan / FR | [1999/01] |
Former [1998/45] | 01 /
COMMARIEU, Annie 4, boulevard des Pyrénées F-64000 Pau / FR | ||
02 /
BAZIN, Isabelle Chemin du Berdoulou F-64290 Gan / FR | Representative(s) | Leboulenger, Jean Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris la Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Leboulenger, Jean Elf Atochem S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle, Cedex 42 - La Défense 10 92091 Paris la Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 96939126.7 | 15.11.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996FR01806 | Priority number, date | FR19950013641 | 17.11.1995 Original published format: FR 9513641 | [1998/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719057 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874810 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874810 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C315/06, C07C317/04 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C07C315/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07C317/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C315/06, C07C317/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON DIMETHYLSULFOXYD (DMSO) | [1998/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PURIFYING DIMETHYL SULPHOXIDE (DMSO) | [1998/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DU DIMETHYLSULFOXYDE (DMSO) | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 06.02.2002 | GR | 06.02.2002 | DK | 06.05.2002 | PT | 06.05.2002 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/19] | FI | 06.02.2002 | |
GR | 06.02.2002 | ||
PT | 06.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 06.02.2002 | |
PT | 06.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 06.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]BE656879 (CROWN ZELLERBACH CO) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]FR2014385 (GLANZSTOFF AG) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD] - A.M. PHIPPS, ANAL. CHEM., (1968), vol. 40, no. 12, pages 1769 - 1773, XP000563242 [AD] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac60268a016 | [A] - T. CHAUDRON ET AL, CHIMIE ANALYTIQUE, (1971), vol. 53, no. 5, pages 310 - 314, XP002004909 |